Financial history DAUNTSEY VALE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1073615
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £968 £1.13k £1.76k £1.61k £1.85k
Total expenditure £2.41k £520 £2.94k £1.09k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A