HANDICAP INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1082565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Humanity Inclusion UK (HI UK) is the operating name of Handicap International UK. Humanity & Inclusion is an independent aid organisation working alongside disabled and vulnerable people in around 60 countries affected by poverty, conflict and disaster. Our vision is a world of solidarity and inclusion, enriched by our differences, where everyone can live in dignity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Afghanistan
  • Bangladesh
  • Burkina Faso
  • Chad
  • Colombia
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Egypt
  • Jordan
  • Lebanon
  • Libya
  • Madagascar
  • Morocco
  • Nepal
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Senegal
  • South Sudan
  • Sri Lanka
  • Syria
  • Togo
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HI UK (Working name)
  • HUMANITY & INCLUSION UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Marshall Chair 28 February 2025
MARLBOROUGH HOUSE VINEHALL SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Peter Burdin Trustee 28 February 2025
AMERSHAM FREE CHURCH
Received: On time
Stephanie Milano Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Oliver Thorn Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Nicola Peckett Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Ayse Guel Suevari-Wicks Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
Nana Obuo Raphael Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
Thomas Charles Morrow Trustee 30 March 2020
None on record
Vhernie Manickavasagar Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.79m £17.13m £10.34m £9.94m £8.06m
Total expenditure £13.79m £17.13m £10.34m £9.94m £8.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.33m £7.89m £2.43m £1.07m £322.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04m £1.88m £1.85m £2.33m £2.05m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.74m £15.25m £8.39m £7.44m £5.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £101.65k £175.33k £243.79k
Income - Legacies £166.67k £3.33k £132.86k £141.11k £121.88k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.96m £16.26m £9.57m £8.99m £7.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £822.28k £872.69k £771.16k £953.21k £904.41k
Expenditure - Governance £65.09k £72.84k £57.27k £56.83k £60.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £77.44k £61.21k £51.83k £35.80k £33.56k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £5.93m £7.76m £6.51m £5.04m £2.77m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.73m £7.54m £6.28m £4.80m £2.52m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Romero House
55 Westminster Bridge Road
LONDON
SE1 7JB
Phone:
08707743737