MONTGOMERY AREA RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Montgomery Area Riding for the Disabled Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,457
Total expenditure: £7,676

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MONTGOMERY AREA R D A (Working name)
  • RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION MONTGOMERY AREA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claudia Jones Chair 17 July 2018
THE ORCHARD FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Elaine Etherington Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Helen Fay Leitch Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Debra Cox Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Sharon Louise Hughes Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
MRS MAGGIE TOMLEY Trustee 08 September 2011
None on record
BRONWEN ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £2.20k £4.20k £6.45k £7.46k
Total expenditure £5.30k £1.73k £4.53k £6.36k £7.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LITTLE BARN
CROESAUBACH
OSWESTRY
SY10 9BG
Phone:
01691652062
Website:

No information available