MANCHESTER CARERS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of sick, elderly and disabled persons in the Manchester area by the provision of facilities to relieve the stresses experienced by their carers. To provide a range of high quality information, advice, emotional and practical support services for carers including access to respite care, breaks, training and learning opportunities, peer support and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £100,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 08 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE STOPFORTH | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
RUCKSANA MAHMOOD | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
ANTHONY RICHARD KIRVEN | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
CATHERINE ANNE HEANEY | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev WINIFRED AUDRIA CAMPBELL | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Lisa Dawn Ellan Fowles | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Canon Dr Addy Lazz-Onyenobi | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Colin Thompson | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID PRIOR | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.25k | £352.67k | £246.87k | £229.90k | £166.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.85k | £279.74k | £283.77k | £207.80k | £227.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £163.49k | £221.78k | £222.80k | £157.29k | £100.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 OCTOBER 2001 AND 21 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICK, ELDERLY AND DISABLED PERSONS IN THE MANCHESTER AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY THEIR CARERS; AND TO PROVIDE THEIR CARERS WITH INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND A WIDE RANGE OF SERVICES APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANCHESTER CARERS CENTRE
BRIDGE 5 MILL
22a BESWICK STREET
MANCHESTER
M4 7HR
- Phone:
- 01612727270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window