THE SIR HENRY STEPHENSON ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income from the endowment is used to support a visiting professorship, financial support and funding for residential experiences for University of Sheffield students and graduates meeting certain criteria. Additional activities will include a lecture series and one-day colloquium.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE VERY REVEREND DR PETE WILCOX | Chair | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Bill Goodman | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Abi Thompson | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Koen Lamberts | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Casey Strine | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Jeremy Clines | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Murray | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Annabel Dunn | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
OLIVER STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.29k | £10.65k | £10.96k | £10.67k | £13.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £4.77k | £14.27k | £22.61k | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 MAY 1950
Charitable objects
(1) IN THE AWARD OF A FELLOWSHIP TO BE CALLED THE "SIR HENRY STEPHENSON FELLOWSHIP" TENABLE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SHEFFIELD BY A PERSON WHO IS:- A) AN ACTUAL COMMUNICANT MEMBER OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (WITH A PREFERENCE FOR A PERSON WHO IS OR INTENDS TO BE IN HOLY ORDERS IN THE SAID CHURCH), AND B) A GRADUATE OF A UNIVERSITY IN THE BRITISH ISLES OR OF SOME OTHER UNIVERSITY APPROVED FOR THAT PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; AND SUBJECT THERETO: (2) IN THE AWARD OF GRANTS OR BURSARIES TO PERSONS STUDYING FOR HOLY ORDER IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE GRADUATES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF SHEFFIELD); (3) IN THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS ATTENDING THE UNIVERSITY OF SHEFFIELD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of Sheffield
University's Secretary's Office
Arts Tower
Bolsover Street
SHEFFIELD
S3 7NA
- Phone:
- 01142221741
- Email:
- r.barker@sheffield.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window