THE JASPAR GROUP - BROMLEY RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide disabled people with the means to ride,at the level of their ability, to the benifit of their health and wellbeing. To acquire, manage and support the resources needed for the above and to finance the objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 24 February 1999: Standard registration
- 04 December 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 December 2012: Funds transferred to 291623 ARROW RIDING CENTRE FOR DISABLED
- THE JASPAR GROUP - BROMLEY (Working name)
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION THE JASPER GROUP - BROMLEY (Previous name)
- THE JASPER GROUP - BROMLEY RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £4.67k | £3.51k | £1.28k | £2.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £11.51k | £11.40k | £11.80k | £12.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE BROMLEY AREA
Area of benefit
BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window