Financial history THE SUE HOOPER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1083647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £41 £196 £1.11k £1.37k £1.86k
Total expenditure £230 £162 £749 £2.08k £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A