THE CHURCHES TOGETHER IN HEALD GREEN YOUTH INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of Youth Facilities TAG (Talking about God) at Life Church, Heald Green. Opens two afternoons and evenings per week as a safe place for young people. During August organises a series of holiday events. Youth Worker is also involved in local Secondary Schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Stockport
Governance
- 12 July 1999: Standard registration
- THE CHURCHES IN HEALD GREEN YOUTH INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Hughes | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Fox | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacob Devadason | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARKALL | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN SPENCER REAM | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN HANDLEY | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CAROL MARSH HAIGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.84k | £10.63k | £12.98k | £8.89k | £10.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.43k | £6.49k | £5.42k | £7.12k | £8.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR THEM TO GATHER FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
HEALD GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Heald Green URC
234 Wilmslow Road
Heald Green
CHEADLE
SK8 3BH
- Phone:
- 0161 850 0770
- Email:
- katekinsey90@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window