ST BASIL'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Basils works with young people to enable them to find and keep a home, to develop their confidence, skills and opportunities and to prevent homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£17,178,326
Donations and legacies | £1.21m | |
Charitable activities | £14.51m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £76.35k | |
Other | £1.38m |
Total expenditure:
£16,814,472
Raising funds | £519.33k | |
Charitable activities | £16.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,126,287 from 20 government contract(s) and £235,398 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £519.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.30m | |
Retained for future use | £363.85k |
People

285 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- ST BASILS (Working name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feizal Hajat OBE | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen Derrone James Chance | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Victoria Louise Stott | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nilanthi Neale | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nimmi Patel | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rajinder Ram | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
The Very Reverend Matthew Thompson | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Paul Martin Cadman | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Helen Bates | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JEAN TEMPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00m | £13.77m | £14.41m | £15.32m | £17.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.70m | £13.13m | £14.28m | £15.07m | £16.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.95m | £6.37m | £6.54m | £6.94m | £7.13m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £90.95k | £259.33k | £214.37k | £235.40k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £985.00k | £1.78m | £998.87k | £958.25k | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.02m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £10.77m | £12.25m | £13.18m | £14.51m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.00k | £1.28k | £736 | £9.04k | £76.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.21m | £1.16m | £1.17m | £1.38m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £52.68k | £4.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.14m | £12.64m | £13.74m | £14.54m | £16.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £563.00k | £486.71k | £540.98k | £535.74k | £519.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.00k | £174.76k | £119.19k | £125.85k | £148.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.48m | £14.61m | £14.35m | £13.97m | £17.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.99m | £4.61m | £4.95m | £6.71m | £7.85m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.01m | £14.13m | £14.08m | £15.20m | £19.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SOCIAL HOUSING 3.1 TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES OR ASSISTANCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE HOMELESS OR IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING 3.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR SECURING EDUCATION OR TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND BY ASSISTING THEM TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.3 TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE BOARD THINKS FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; EDUCATION 3.4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES OR THROUGH PROVIDING OR ARRANGING WORK EXPERIENCE; RELIEF OF POVERTY 3.5 TO RELIEVE POVERTY GENERALLY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; RECREATIONAL FACILITIES 3.6 TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO NEED SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; GENERAL 3.7 TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heath Mill Lane
Deritend
Birmingham
B9 4AX
- Phone:
- 01217722483
- Email:
- governance@stbasils.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window