MULBERRY SCHOOL (TOWER HAMLETS) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education related
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 28 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Louise Barrow | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Traynor | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MUJIBUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 February 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/03/2020 | 25/03/2021 | 25/03/2022 | 25/03/2023 | 25/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62 | £32 | £0 | £231 | £1.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 March 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18TH MAY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING MULBERRY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS BY BY IMPLEMENTING AND ENHANCING THE EDUCATIONAL PROVISION OF THE SCHOOL THEREBY ASSISTING THE DELIVERY OF THE CURRICULUM AT THE SCHOOL PARTICULARLY IN SUBJECTS SUCH AS SPORTS AND THE ARTS THROUGH PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT AT THE SCHOOL AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED THAT IN SO DOING THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT RELIEVE THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR ANY OTHER STATUTORY BODY OF ITS STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mulberry School for Girls
Mulberry School
Richard Street
LONDON
E1 2JP
- Phone:
- 02077906327
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window