STREET LEVEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 Assist young people 2 Advancement of Christain faith and Education 3 Relief of persons who are in condition of need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 17 May 2000: Standard registration
- STREET LEVEL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GRAHAM HUNTER | Chair | 13 April 2015 | ||||||
Ian Nelthorpe | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Large | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £0 | £5.01k | £11.32k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.83k | £0 | £0 | £16.01k | £10.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN CONJUNCTION WITH LOCAL CHURCHES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN YOUTH WORK AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHRISTIAN RESOURCE CENTRE AND TRAINING FOR CHURCH WORKERS AND LEADERS (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD AND ASSISTANCE FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE AND REFUGEES.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY THE HOXTON AND SHOREDITCH AREAS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
85 Pitfield Street
LONDON
N1 6NP
- Phone:
- 02077399302
- Email:
- info@streetlevel.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window