Financial history TORAH ( 5759 ) LIMITED

Charity number: 1075939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £524.22k £544.34k £691.74k £807.11k £558.93k
Total expenditure £619.59k £521.98k £717.10k £796.78k £569.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £69.13k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £524.22k £544.34k £691.74k £807.11k £558.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £612.04k £521.84k £708.32k £774.64k £563.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.54k £142 £8.78k £22.15k £5.61k
Expenditure - Governance £4.48k £4.29k £3.05k £5.12k £5.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £71.11k £101.11k £47.74k £74.23k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0