FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF

Charity Number: 1079893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the Holy Land Institute for the Deaf.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £31,905
Total expenditure: £30,755

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Jordan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALLAH KARIEM (UK) (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LANDINSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN GEORGE ALLEN Chair 12 January 2012
None on record
Matthew Robert Adeane Hanning Trustee 15 November 2023
TRELIX CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TIMOTHY JAMES MARTIN Trustee 25 November 2012
None on record
URSULA ELIZABETH MARTELL MB BS Trustee
NORTHERN LADIES ANNUITY SOCIETY
Received: On time
HELEN PENFOLD Trustee
SAMUEL SIMS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.02k £36.48k £30.01k £47.20k £31.91k
Total expenditure £37.54k £38.69k £25.60k £48.37k £30.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lodge Farm
Aldwincle
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN14 3EN
Phone:
07785314082