THE WARMINSTER ATHENAEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has roots back to 1850, with the current trust created in September 2000 by merging the Athenaeum Trust and the Bleeck Memorial Hall charities. The Trust serves residents of Warminster and the surrounding areas in the provision of Education, Community Support and Entertainment, for both residents and visitors to the town.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 April 2001: Standard registration
- ATHENAEUM ARTS CENTRE WARMINSTER WILTSHIRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ellis | Chair | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jeffries | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Cray | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Page | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Keeble | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Arthur | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susi Tenty | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Benedict James | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Jack Jones | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Ellis | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FROSTICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.21k | £119.65k | £106.40k | £40.01k | £63.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.87k | £124.77k | £89.56k | £47.72k | £61.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.50k | £12.00k | £50.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 June 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 June 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2000 as amended on 06 Oct 2017 as amended on 07 Sept 2024 as amended on 02 Nov 2024 as amended on 12 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CENTRE FOR THE COMMUNITY FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (C) TO FURTHER ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
WARMINSTER AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Athenaeum Centre
18-20 High Street
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 9AE
- Phone:
- 01985 213891
- Email:
- secretary@theath.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window