Trustees THE WARMINSTER ATHENAEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1086353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Ellis Chair 09 October 2023
None on record
Stephen Jeffries Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Jack Cray Trustee 09 August 2024
None on record
Duncan Page Trustee 09 August 2024
None on record
Philip John Keeble Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Jennifer Arthur Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Susi Tenty Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Simon Benedict James Trustee 09 September 2023
THE MANSEL THOMAS TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 562 days
Jack Jones Trustee 09 September 2023
WESTBURY AND WARMINSTER YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
Joanna Ellis Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Anthony Jackson Trustee 06 November 2015
None on record
ANDREW FROSTICK Trustee
None on record