Financial history COMMUNITY AWARENESS PROGRAMME

Charity Number: 1076401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £176.37k £99.46k £140.04k £172.37k £135.52k
Total expenditure £142.00k £141.26k £173.85k £165.96k £144.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k £10.80k £23.26k N/A N/A