COMMUNITY AWARENESS PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeking to relieve the want and poverty in Wakefield and the surrounding areas by providing a Resource Centre. Opening 5 days a week clients from any race or background via a referral system can visit the CAP centre. Here they will find friendship, counselling, clothing, shower facility and referral to other agencies as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 06 July 1999: Standard registration
- 07 March 2023: Funds received from 1130138 BETHANY HOUSE HEALING CENTRE
- CAP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Crompton | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
JUDITH CATHERINE BREARTON | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY RHODES CANNINGS | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHNATHON ERIC GLEDHILL | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HEMSWORTH | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAY COX | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CARROLL | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH HIBBERT | Trustee | 05 September 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.37k | £99.46k | £140.04k | £172.37k | £135.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.00k | £141.26k | £173.85k | £165.96k | £144.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | £10.80k | £23.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2021
(These accounts |
30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WAKEFIELD, WEST YORKSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND RELIEVE POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2-8 Market Street
Wakefield
WF1 1DH
- Phone:
- 01924381119
- Email:
- capoffice@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window