SUTTON SENIORS' FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Participation in this non-party-political group helps older people in Sutton and surrounding areas overcome social isolation by monthly forum meetings, outings and other activities; the group also conducts research and campaigns on relevant issues, representing member's views on local decision-making committees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 04 May 2000: Standard registration
- SSF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY TODMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
CLIVE ROBERT ORTON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Nali Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Indira Harshad Amin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Gordon Jones | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY STEENSMA | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM LYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £694 | £2.67k | £11.11k | £10.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.69k | £2.55k | £5.53k | £6.24k | £8.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 29 AUGUST 2003 AND 9 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON. TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH SUTTON OLDER PEOPLE'S INVOLVEMENT GROUP (OPIG).
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sutton Seniors Forum
C/O Sutton Lodge Day Centre
139 Brighton Road
SUTTON
Surrey
SM2 5SW
- Phone:
- 07377 939761
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window