Financial history BENCH OUTREACH

Charity number: 1077933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £475.16k £668.46k £629.26k £524.90k £554.30k
Total expenditure £424.24k £528.50k £668.87k £707.31k £587.53k
Income from government contracts £57.81k £222.81k £232.69k £200.00k £162.25k
Income from government grants £67.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £335.82k £296.77k £291.89k £372.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £332.05k £331.89k £230.80k £180.51k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £589 £606 £2.21k £800
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £528.27k £668.61k £706.71k £587.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £230 £257 £604 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.50k £1.50k £6.08k £6.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0