Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION KENLEY AND CATERHAM BRANCH NO.661

Charity number: 1075354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.35k £9.82k £5.92k £6.05k £5.37k
Total expenditure £1.92k £3.64k £2.15k £4.57k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A