Accounts and annual returns CASTLE POINT SOCIAL CAR SCHEME LIMITED
Charity number: 1076007

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Your cookie preferences have been updated
Cookies on My Charity Commission Account
Cookies are files saved on your phone, tablet or computer when you visit a website.
We use cookies to collect information about how you use My Charity Commission Account.
Cookie settings
We use 2 types of cookie.
Cookies that measure website use
We use Google Analytics to measure how you use the website so we can improve it based on user needs. We do not allow Google to use or share the data about how you use this site with third parties.
Google Analytics sets cookies that store anonymised information about:
- how you got to the site
- the pages you visit and how long you spend on each page
- what you click on while you're visiting the site
Strictly necessary cookies
These essential cookies do things like enable core functionality such as security, network management, and accessibility.
They always need to be on.
Find out more about cookies on My Charity Commission Account.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window