RADBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Radbrook and neighbourhood by associating with other organisations to advance education and provide facilities in the interest of social welfare and leisure time occupation, and to manage and maintain a community centre in futherence of these objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 26 May 1999: Standard registration
- RADBROOK GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS BURGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CHRISTOPHER FATHERS | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
SUSAN RUTH BEIGHTON | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mason | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Haywood | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gorton | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Barrow | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Hall | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Roberts | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amal Lattif Moore BAhons | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Bradley | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Heathorn | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALBERT HYLTON EDGAR ORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.20k | £2.80k | £20.59k | £22.45k | £27.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.55k | £23.14k | £15.92k | £24.23k | £30.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED 11 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
RADBROOK GREEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD ( FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2(A) OF THE CONSTITUTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
11
High Ridge Way
Shrewsbury
- Phone:
- 01743364721
- Email:
- bookings@radbrookcc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window