ABINGTON COMMUNITY OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1075808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a home from home environment delivering daily care, recreation and education for children outside school hours via a breakfast club and 3 hours after regular school hours to children from the age of 2.5 - 14 years. A holiday club supports provision is also in operation. Children are attend from the local Primary School and surrounding villages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,247
Total expenditure: £45,279

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GAPS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Kirk Chair 08 April 2021
ABINGTON PRE SCHOOL
Received: On time
Gabriella Hope Trustee 14 November 2024
ABINGTON ANNEXE COMMUNITY CHILDCARE
Received: On time
Katherine Russell Trustee 14 November 2024
ABINGTON ANNEXE COMMUNITY CHILDCARE
Received: On time
Sarah Jarvis-Dott Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Kirsty Badcock Trustee 17 November 2022
ABINGTON ANNEXE COMMUNITY CHILDCARE
Received: On time
ABINGTON PRE SCHOOL
Received: On time
LOUISE WOOLCOTT Trustee 29 October 2021
ABINGTON ANNEXE COMMUNITY CHILDCARE
Received: On time
ABINGTON PRE SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £143.32k £81.66k £105.31k £88.18k £45.25k
Total expenditure £131.51k £96.28k £102.25k £102.76k £45.28k
Income from government contracts £8.30k N/A N/A £3.57k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.51k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ANNEXE
Great Abington Primary School
68 High Street
Great Abington
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 6AE
Phone:
01223 894246