Financial history LIVERPOOL LIGHTHOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1077293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £423.15k £415.65k £545.91k £623.62k £658.66k
Total expenditure £411.17k £375.61k £557.88k £643.54k £689.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.74k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £482.91k £500.53k £522.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £62.86k £116.34k £126.60k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £136 £6.76k £7.46k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £557.88k £643.54k £689.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £77.63k £5.14k £10.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0