Financial history MANOR COURT SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1076601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £10.78k £21.30k £13.77k £4.88k £8.79k
Total expenditure £10.00k £4.96k £4.65k £6.31k £9.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.58k £12.76k N/A N/A