THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To train men and women for ordination or other ministries in the Church of England or other Protestant denominations at Oak Hill College. To advance the physical, mental and spiritual education of children at Kingham Hill School. To otherwise advance education in accordance with the Christian Faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£13,018,000
Donations and legacies | £912.00k | |
Charitable activities | £9.70m | |
Other trading activities | £1.95m | |
Investments | £463.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,436,000
Raising funds | £211.00k | |
Charitable activities | £13.23m | |
Other | £0 |
£445,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £211.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.23m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £211.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.23m | |
Retained for future use | £27.00k |
People

157 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Oxfordshire
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 1999: Standard registration
- KINGHAM HILL SCHOOL (Working name)
- OAK HILL THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Humphrey Westland Pilcher | Chair | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Powell | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Keith Basil Civval | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ALEXANDER MARCHAND EDMUNDS | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE MARGARET PELLEREAU | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Cecil John Bewes | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Jeremy David Bruce Anderson | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.74m | £11.05m | £13.51m | £12.60m | £13.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.48m | £10.87m | £12.74m | £12.57m | £13.44m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £258.00k | £244.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.10m | £1.04m | £973.00k | £1.02m | £912.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.16m | £1.14m | £1.46m | £1.73m | £1.95m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.03m | £8.46m | £10.91m | £9.58m | £9.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £192.00k | £167.00k | £169.00k | £269.00k | £463.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £258.00k | £244.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.33m | £10.73m | £12.58m | £12.41m | £13.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £148.00k | £140.00k | £161.00k | £166.00k | £211.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £99.00k | £60.00k | £104.00k | £64.00k | £129.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £31.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30 | £31.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.48m | £35.48m | £34.73m | £34.04m | £33.96m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.14m | £8.00m | £7.14m | £8.09m | £8.88m | |
|
Other assets | £2.33m | £3.34m | £4.59m | £4.72m | £4.78m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£261.00k | -£210.00k | -£7.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.81m | £6.78m | £6.23m | £6.74m | £7.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MARCH 1941 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13TH JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL FAITH UNDERSTOOD AS SET OUT IN ARTICLE 9.2 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF THE CHARITY ("THE CHRISTIAN FAITH") THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE BY HELPING THEM TO A START IN LIFE, ESPECIALLY THOSE CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NEED OF A BOARDING SCHOOL EDUCATION THROUGH DEFICIENCIES IN THEIR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR FAMILY CIRCUMSTANCES, OR OWING TO THEIR PARTICULAR EDUCATIONAL OR SPIRITUAL REQUIREMENTS PROVIDED THAT SPECIAL REGARD SHALL BE PAID TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE OF MODEST MEANS; (1) TO TRAIN MEN OR WOMEN FOR ORDINATION OR OTHER MINISTRIES IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OTHER PROTESTANT DENOMINATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PROVIDED THAT SPECIAL REGARD SHALL BE PAID TO THE NEEDS OF THOSE OF MODEST MEANS; AND (3) OTHERWISE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingham Hill School
Kingham
Chipping Norton
Oxfordshire
OX7 6TH
- Phone:
- 07733076265
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window