Financial history THE THOMAS BALL CHILDREN'S CANCER FUND

Charity number: 1078140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £60.07k £24.00k £25.83k £33.97k £38.38k
Total expenditure £49.74k £16.80k £21.89k £22.80k £22.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A