Trustees BLOXHAM SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 1076484

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ray Eglington | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Buxton | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Cook | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simone Mitchell | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Renison | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Markwell | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richards | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lance Edward Anelay | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Clayson | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Carol Shaw | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
LIS LEWIS-JONES | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.