BATTERSEA CRIME PREVENTION PANEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please refer to the charitable objects detailed in the charity's entry on the Charity Commission's website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 02 August 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHARLES JONES | Chair |
|
||||||
Syeda Islam | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Freddie Morrison | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Linda Jane Banhan | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Edwards | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL MARTIN STRATTON CBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARLENE GWEN PRICE BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.04k | £83.35k | £94.41k | £204.95k | £180.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.28k | £60.67k | £122.44k | £221.90k | £222.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
THE PANEL IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF, CRIMINAL ACTS: (1) BY ENCOURAGEMENT OF GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME; AND (11) BY ASSISTING THE POLICE IN MEASURES DESIGNED TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF CRIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 714
Tonbridge
TN9 9UN
- Phone:
- 07394585681
- Email:
- bss@bcpp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window