Financial history ADMASTON HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1078231
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.62k £118.68k £116.81k £49.20k £56.57k
Total expenditure £36.35k £25.27k £44.49k £73.00k £88.06k
Income from government contracts £1.06k N/A £545 £993 £1.44k
Income from government grants £12.00k £46.86k £26.62k £4.00k £6.00k