GREAT WESTERN (SVR) ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and restoration of historic carriages and locomotives of the Great Wesrn Railway origin for operation and educational value based on the Severn Valley Line in Worcestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HAYNES | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID ALFRED SMITH | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
BRIAN ARTHUR LOWE | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT MASSEY | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
GARETH PRICE | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
COLUMB WILLIAM HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GRAHAM JOHN GARDENER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Christopher Haynes | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID WILLIAM MASSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN RICHARD JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.75k | £98.69k | £61.40k | £67.13k | £52.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.62k | £54.69k | £30.33k | £66.85k | £50.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY SOCIOLOGY AND TECHNOLOGY OF RAILWAYS IN GENERAL WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE FORMER GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY ("GWR") AND SEVERN VALLEY RAILWAY ("SVR") (TOGETHER THE RAILWAYS") BY ACQUIRING PRESERVING DISPLAYING AND MAKING USE OF HISTORIC ROLLING STOCK ARTIFACTS, RELICS AND DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE RAILWAYS OR RAILWAYS GENERALLY:
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN BEWDLEY, KIDDERMINSTER AND BRIDGNORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ACACIA DRIVE
MELBOURNE
DERBY
DE73 8LT
- Phone:
- 01332864027
- Email:
- mick@hitrail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window