HUNTON AND ARRATHORNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall serving the Parishes of Hunton and Arrathorne. Hiring out of Hall, promotion of events and activities, venue for local events and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 September 1999: Standard registration
- HUNTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Sargent | Chair | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Whitham | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Heath | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lilley | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Bruce | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Jobling | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Huffadine | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hughes | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Robert George Wyatt | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARILYNE BRADFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judith Eileen Knight | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.09k | £23.60k | £19.40k | £18.56k | £18.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.43k | £16.20k | £9.18k | £22.68k | £18.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.93k | £11.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
HUNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fern Cottage
8 Ratten Row, Hunton
BEDALE
Bedale
North Yorkshire
DL8 1QG
- Phone:
- 01677450463
- Email:
- JULIE.SARGENT60@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
huntonarrathornehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window