Trustees THE ALCESTER U3A
Charity number: 1080590

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alan West | Chair | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Jane Sanders | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Dyer | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive John Owen | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Robertson | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rose Randell | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Dowman | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Morgan | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Pickering | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Elsie Hamblin | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
KARYL ARLENE REES | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.