BOROUGH MARKET (SOUTHWARK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a market as a public amenity for the benefit of the public. The Borough Market Trust is committed to playing a leading role in the debate and education about food and its impact on society and public health, and will continue to provide only those foods which meet our standards of nutrition, freshness and taste quality and demonstrate environmental sustainability in their production.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£7,662,417
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.65m | |
Other trading activities | £524.25k | |
Investments | £3.44m | |
Other | £40.00k |
Total expenditure:
£7,904,482
Raising funds | £477.27k | |
Charitable activities | £7.11m | |
Other | £318.89k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £796.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.11m |
People

40 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 06 August 1999: Standard registration
- BOROUGH FOOD MARKET (Working name)
- BOROUGH MARKET (Working name)
- TRUSTEES OF THE BOROUGH MARKET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHANE HOLLAND | Chair | 28 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Chris Shaw | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Dharshan Benedict | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Lam | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danny Homan | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eva George | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erica Sibree | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shawn Anderson | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Dunlop | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE PRITCHARD | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.10m | £5.82m | £6.62m | £7.35m | £7.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.01m | £6.13m | £7.03m | £6.87m | £7.90m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £420.31k | £110.05k | £182.38k | £275.99k | £524.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.57m | £2.46m | £3.24m | £3.79m | £3.65m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.97m | £3.08m | £3.08m | £3.21m | £3.44m | |
|
Income - Other | £135.42k | £167.46k | £118.98k | £77.87k | £40.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.13m | £5.06m | £5.75m | £6.18m | £7.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £692.32k | £972.57k | £339.83k | £511.46k | £477.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £17.35k | £69.27k | £17.65k | £33.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £972.57k | £339.83k | £511.46k | £477.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £188.50k | £95.85k | £941.24k | £173.78k | £318.89k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £29.39m | £27.30m | £26.45m | £26.37m | £93.17m | |
|
Long-term investments | £60.08m | £60.15m | £66.85m | £66.85m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.56m | £5.60m | £8.57m | £8.26m | £7.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£189.00k | -£172.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.22m | £4.03m | £7.06m | £5.83m | £4.61m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GOVERNING BY THE FOLLOWING ACTS 28 GEO II 1754, 30 GEO II 1756, 4 GEO IV 1822, 10 GEO IV 1829 , 55 VICT 1892, 7 EDW VI 1907 AND 20 &21 GEO V 1930 AND SCHEME DATED 21 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 2012 AND 6 SEPT 2012 SCHEME AS AMENDED ON 28 JAN 2021 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A MARKET AS A PUBLIC AMENITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE RELIEF OF THE RATES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST SAVIOURS, SOUTHWARK
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 SOUTHWARK STREET
LONDON
SE1 1TL
- Phone:
- 02074071002
- Email:
- info@boroughmarket.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window