Financial history SABENO LIMITED

Charity number: 1078583
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £563.30k £647.27k £974.16k £573.18k £1.27m
Total expenditure £363.60k £376.63k £431.99k £439.09k £556.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £84.00k £138.55k £351.36k £41.60k £656.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £479.30k £508.72k £622.80k £531.58k £617.71k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £138.55k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £223.86k £179.68k £290.46k £282.72k £276.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £118.11k £183.60k £126.08k £136.15k £244.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £223.86k £179.68k £290.46k £282.72k £276.36k
Expenditure - Investment management £118.11k £183.60k £126.08k £136.15k £244.00k
Expenditure - Other £21.63k £13.36k £15.45k £20.22k £36.32k