THE QUEEN'S ROYAL HUSSARS COLLECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect, update and repair for the future the property of the Queens Royal Hussars Collection, and to maintain and run three museums to display it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- East Sussex
- Warwickshire
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 October 1999: Standard registration
- QRH COLLECTION FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Retd RICHARD METCALFE OBE | Chair | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Inglis | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peters | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Milton | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Anthony Paul Glover | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heidi Meyer | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Major Retd JAMES AUSTIN | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL M MUMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.26k | £55.70k | £52.55k | £46.19k | £22.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.45k | £773 | £47.48k | £40.86k | £18.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JULY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RE-CONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS IN THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HHQ QRH
REGENTS PARK BARRACKS
ALBANY STREET
LONDON
NW1 4AL
- Phone:
- 02077562273
- Email:
- regsec@qrhussars.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window