THE ANNA FREUD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Anna Freud Centre improves the lives of thousands of children and young people with mental health problems every year. It provides a vital lifeline for families under pressure and is the UK's only children's mental health organisation to combine practice, training and world-class research, with a focus on family well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£24,670,297
Donations and legacies | £3.80m | |
Charitable activities | £20.20m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £71.81k | |
Other | £597.39k |
Total expenditure:
£25,736,769
Raising funds | £627.41k | |
Charitable activities | £25.11m | |
Other | £0 |
-£36,749 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,433,011 from 9 government contract(s) and £105,065 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £627.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.11m |
People

443 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 17 |
£70k to £80k | 8 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 August 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HON MICHAEL SAMUEL | Chair | 22 September 2002 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Antonia Cowdry | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Anne-Marie Huby | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Evans | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Namrata Kamdar | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Victoria-Rose Cadogan | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sarah Florence Wood | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Pamela Susan Hutchinson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Professor Stephen Pilling | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Catherine Anne Bedford | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Daniel Peltz | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
Peter Oppenheimer | Trustee | 30 October 2008 |
|
|||||||||||||
PROFESSOR LINDA MAYES MD | Trustee | 30 January 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.19m | £16.22m | £16.89m | £21.99m | £24.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.76m | £16.59m | £16.75m | £19.97m | £25.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.25m | £3.56m | £1.67m | £1.19m | £6.43m | |
|
Income from government grants | £221.53k | £1.20m | £72.56k | £29.70k | £105.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.19m | £3.76m | £3.77m | £4.69m | £3.80m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.89m | £11.99m | £12.69m | £16.27m | £20.20m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £62.95k | £58.97k | £61.18k | £69.79k | £71.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £37.91k | £410.76k | £374.03k | £959.64k | £597.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £15.52m | £16.25m | £16.37m | £19.42m | £25.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £238.03k | £341.39k | £383.48k | £553.26k | £627.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.55k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £47.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £100.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £502 | £720 | £235 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £37.27m | £36.64m | £35.95m | £35.26m | £35.74m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.88m | £1.92m | £2.66m | £2.50m | £2.53m | |
|
Other assets | £5.33m | £6.34m | £6.41m | £9.74m | £10.00m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.58m | £13.29m | £13.04m | £13.74m | £15.62m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/12/2012 as amended on 12 Sep 2022 as amended on 19 Jun 2023 as amended on 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: 3.1 the promotion for the public benefit of the awareness, prevention and relief of mental illness or disorder and the protection and preservation of mental wellbeing and emotional health, in particular but without prejudice to the generality, by the means of: 3.1.1 the practice of and research into psychological and other appropriate methods of therapy and support for infants, children, young people, and adults; 3.1.2 training infant, child, adolescent and adult psychological therapists and those directly working to support children and families; and 3.1.3 supporting communities to facilitate diverse approaches to support the mental health and wellbeing of infants, children, young people and parents and carers; 3.2 the advancement of education for the public benefit, in particular but without prejudice to the generality, by: 3.2.1 providing training and education in the field of mental health; 3.2.2 carrying out research in the field of mental health; and 3.2.3 by establishing, maintaining and supporting educational institutions including free schools and academies. (“the Objects”).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4-8 Rodney Street
LONDON
N1 9JH
- Phone:
- 02077942313
- Email:
- info@annafreud.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window