THE RINGSFIELD HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Educating children and young people so as to support their physical, emotional and spiritual development through outdoor learning *Research and development for social and emotional learning, environmental education and spirituality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 August 2002: Standard registration
- RINGSFIELD CHRISTIAN ECO-STUDY CENTRE (Working name)
- RINGSFIELD ECO-STUDY CENTRE (Working name)
- THE RINGSFIELD HALL TRUST LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT CARL CANNELL | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Julian Langford | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Bee | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev PHILIP HUGH OWEN MILLER | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.92k | £157.14k | £246.50k | £177.41k | £150.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.22k | £198.07k | £146.54k | £182.63k | £227.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £116.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 23 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
3.1 TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN THROUGH THEIR EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MIGHT BE IMPROVED; IN PARTICULAR, BY MEETINGS, LECTURES, RESIDENTIAL COURSES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF LEISURE TIME, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL OCCUPATION; 3.2 THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND RESIDENTIAL COURSES; 3.3 TO FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS BY THE FOUNDATION AND MAINTENANCE OF S RESIDENTIAL COUNTRY CENTRE AND THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO ATTEND THE CENTRE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD TO DO SO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SENECA I P LTD
SPEEDWELL MILL
OLD COACH ROAD
TANSLEY
MATLOCK
DE4 5FY
- Phone:
- 01502713020
- Email:
- info@ringsfield-hall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window