Trustees SHOPMOBILITY YORK

Charity number: 1077500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TREVOR PHILLIPS Chair
None on record
Amanda Thornton Trustee 03 April 2025
None on record
Shan Braund Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Janet Dale Trustee 11 April 2021
None on record
Paul Firth Trustee 13 January 2014
WIGGINTON RECREATION HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Turner Trustee 21 January 2013
None on record
DANIEL SAM BECKINGTON Trustee
None on record
STEVEN MARK BURN Trustee
THE THREE BEARS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DUCKWORTH TRUST
Received: On time