Financial history FOUNDATION FOR THE SOCIOLOGY OF HEALTH AND ILLNESS

Charity number: 1078203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £365.48k £357.47k £338.23k £357.44k £369.00k
Total expenditure £231.31k £166.22k £285.12k £359.06k £297.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A