Financial history WINDERMERE YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1082229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.33k £2.05k £15.11k £9.12k £5.11k
Total expenditure £10.08k £2.52k £12.16k £13.33k £13.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A