THE MARY POTTER CONVENT HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
giving of donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Peart | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Jenny Leggott | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Gibney | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clunie | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN GOULDING | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN FINN | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WITHERSPOON | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISTER JEANNETTE CONNELL | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|||||
MERVYN BERNARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.54k | £113.99k | £171.27k | £165.24k | £160.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.24k | £138.03k | £187.02k | £202.58k | £171.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
(I) TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND (INCLUDING PHYSICAL INJURIES) AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH IN ANY WAY WHICH SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING BE CHARITABLE IN LAW (II) TO ASSIST BY MONETARY GRANT OR OTHER MEANS MEMBERS OF THE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY AND OTHERS IN NEED OF RESIDENTIAL CARE OF ANY KIND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROTHERA BRAY LLP SOLICITORS
ROSSELL HOUSE
TUDOR SQUARE
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 6BT
- Phone:
- 01158511603
- Email:
- martinw@massers.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window