THE LIGHTSHIP - SALISBURY CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Professional, affordable Christian counselling in the Salisbury and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 October 1999: Standard registration
- THE LIGHTSHIP - SALISBURY CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE (Working name)
- THE SALISBURY LIGHTSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
GLENDA PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN POLLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.67k | £4.09k | £7.41k | £8.65k | £9.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £4.95k | £6.03k | £6.16k | £7.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE AND CENTRE IN SALISBURY, IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY, IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rose House
11 Harnwood Road
Salisbury
SP2 8DD
- Phone:
- 01722500225
- Email:
- glendapike1973@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window