COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PERSONS AND PRINCIPALLY CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND STUDENTS IN THE ART, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF THE CULTURAL SIGNIFICANCE OF DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE AND TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS IN EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THOSE PERFORMING ARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 2000: Standard registration
- CDET (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR DANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baroness Wilcox Of Newport Deborah Ann Wilcox | Chair | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Earl of Clancarty Nicholas Power Richard le Poer Trench | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Deirdre McFarland | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Adnyana | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Michelle Johann Major-Butler | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregg Whelan | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Alice Avery | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Pearson | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PAUL WOOD | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Michael Robert Dixon | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
David William Grindrod | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.79k | £271.38k | £302.92k | £303.56k | £389.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.44k | £239.07k | £283.83k | £303.15k | £385.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 APR 2018 as amended on 29 Apr 2024 as amended on 10 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the education of all persons and principally children, young people and students in the art, practice and appreciation of the cultural significant of dance, drama, music and musical theatre, and to promote high standards in education and training across the performing arts and related technical activities (including, without limitation, production skills).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Council for Dance Drama and Musical Theatre
4 London Wall Place
LONDON
EC2Y 5AU
- Phone:
- 02072405703
- Email:
- info@cdmt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window