Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1078149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £63.77k £169.20k £63.65k £54.76k £56.12k
Total expenditure £85.25k £94.13k £89.68k £97.57k £100.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A