LEO HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness of children and young people with terminal or life-limiting illness and the relief of need, hardship and distress of the families of those young people or children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 April 2002: Standard registration
- 05 July 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 July 2024: Funds transferred to 256789 Southern Hospice Group
- LEO HOUSE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.69k | £386.30k | £19.56k | £28.26k | £23.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.35k | £51.34k | £52.07k | £26.36k | £51.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8TH JULY 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED ON 20TH AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH TERMINAL OR LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE FAMILIES OF THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window