WYCLIFFE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's principal activities are to provide assistance for any pupil at Wycliffe College by granting scholarships and awards; to assist in the improvement, modernisation and maintenance of Wycliffe College and its property; to assist in the further education of any former pupil of Wycliffe College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 November 1999: Standard registration
- WYCLIFFE ENDOWMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Frederick Modlin Lloyd | Chair | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian Antonio San Jose | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Bernard Godley | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Retired Robin John Bacon MBA FCIPD | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Caroline Jane Duckworth | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.19k | £35.94k | £175.54k | £129.96k | £38.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.35k | £45.48k | £26.75k | £85.18k | £141.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE COLLEGE IN PARTICULAR BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MAKING AND GRANTING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, GRANTS, AWARDS, PRIZES AND OTHER BENEFACTIONS TENABLE AT THE COLLEGE; (B) FURTHERING OR IMPROVING THE EDUCATION AFFORDED BY THE COLLEGE; (C) IMPROVING, MODERNISING OR MAINTAINING THE BUILDINGS AND GROUNDS OF THE COLLEGE; AND (D) BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
STONEHOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Finance Department
Wycliffe College
Regent Street
STONEHOUSE
Gloucestershire
GL10 2AD
- Phone:
- 01453822432
- Email:
- finance@wycliffe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window