THE EVERTON FORMER-PLAYERS' FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 - to relieve, in cases of need, hardship or distress, persons who are or have been fomer players of Everton Football Club and the widows and dependants of such persons.2 - to educate young persons through their leisure time activities 3 - to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupations in the interests of social welfare for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Hart | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Barbara King | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Dixon | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Cockram | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Henry Mooney | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY KELLEHER | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
FREDDY PEACOCK | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DARREN GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERRY MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE MYLES LEE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.67k | £12.40k | £2.09k | £3.07k | £12.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.12k | £26.91k | £19.01k | £17.48k | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 16/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN FORMER PLAYERS OF EVERTON FOOTBALL CLUB AND THE WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. TO EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kenwright & Co
Champions Business Park
Arrowe Brook Road
WIRRAL
CH49 0AB
- Phone:
- 0151-677-5737
- Email:
- p.labone@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window