THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS

Charity number: 1078201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Connection at St Martin's works with people who are rough sleeping to move away from, and stay off, the streets of London. We're alongside people as they recover from life on the streets and move towards a meaningful, fulfilling future away from homelessness and into shelter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN'S (Working name)
  • ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS SOCIAL CARE UNIT (Previous name)
  • ST MARTINS IN THE FIELD SOCIAL CARE UNIT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jakes David Ferguson Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Anna Charlotte Payton Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Olivia Blaney Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Melvene Adams Trustee 18 April 2023
ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS TRUST
Received: On time
Kunal Krishna Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Alicia Walker Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Frances Stainer Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Luc Leclercq Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Maeve Walsh Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Catherine Cherry Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Jill Kyne Trustee 04 December 2018
MIND IN CROYDON LTD
Received: On time
Peter John Curtis Warren Trustee 17 July 2018
GIRLS' EDUCATION COMPANY LTD
Received: On time
Simon David Myles Rawson Trustee 17 July 2018
THAMES REACH CHARITY
Received: On time
Keith Andrew Starling Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
TIM JONES Trustee 04 March 2014
SAFER LONDON
Received: On time
Rev SAMUEL MARTIN WELLS Trustee 14 January 2013
BISHOP HO MING WAH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS HIGH SCHOOL GOVERNORS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.21m £6.94m £5.38m £4.85m £5.19m
Total expenditure £5.50m £5.28m £5.63m £5.34m £5.57m
Income from government contracts N/A £160.82k £177.57k £177.57k £595.31k
Income from government grants £824.60k £1.60m £997.92k £99.28k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.50m £4.18m £3.24m £3.67m £3.65m
Income - Other trading activities £111.84k £161.86k £123.73k £119.58k £183.97k
Income - Charitable activities £1.58m £2.33m £1.99m £1.05m £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.35k £17.55k £19.99k £17.04k £108.42k
Income - Other £0 £248.12k £0 £0 £49.61k
Income - Legacies £448.21k £550.69k £897.62k £1.07m £765.99k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.96m £4.76m £4.93m £4.56m £4.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £516.32k £524.74k £698.79k £779.61k £757.97k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £11.71k £12.60k £12.34k £15.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £19.23k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £76.36k £69.94k £58.78k £76.09k £134.79k
Long-term investments £458.03k £550.12k £842.96k £826.08k £934.50k
Other assets £1.96m £3.63m £3.13m £2.56m £2.17m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £389.23k £396.04k £388.26k £315.91k £466.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CONNECTION AT ST. MARTINS
12 ADELAIDE STREET
LONDON
WC2N 4HW
Phone:
02077665544