CHELMSFORD ROUND TABLE NO. 132 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO AID THE NEEDY IN OUR LOCAL COMMUNITY THROUGH GIVING OF OUR TIME. FUNDRAISING TO SUPPORT A NUMBER LOCAL CHARITIES AND SPECIFIC EVENTS (FIREWORKS DISPLAY, SANTA SLEIGH, SENIOR CITIZENS CHRISTMAS PARTY).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 28 January 2000: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan James | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Scrivener | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Perdeep Grewal | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Luke Alan Hurley | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2020 | 02/04/2021 | 02/04/2022 | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.22k | £19.36k | £77.97k | £94.84k | £83.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.82k | £20.02k | £61.04k | £62.74k | £78.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES OR IN FURTHERANCE OF AN EVENT OR EVENTS ORGANISED BY THE TABLE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RAISING FUNDS FOR SUCH PURPOSES FOR DISTRIBUTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND/OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE INDIVIDUALS CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TABLE IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN IT ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, THE TABLE SHALL COMMUNICATE SUCH DETERMINATION TO THE TRUSTEES IN WRITING
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 Millfields
Writtle
CHELMSFORD
CM1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 01277841555
- Email:
- Chelmsford@roundtable.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window